THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIDCOMBE, BATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £11,753 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 07 March 2019: Standard registration
- WIDCOMBE PCC, BATH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Laura Doe | Chair | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frederick William Sherratt | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mary Ann Oldham | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Ellen Rachel Levenson | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Donald Udale-Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarena Sherratt | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harry Collin | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miles Andrews | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Mathews | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John James Duncan | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel Lloyd-Carter MMus. BA | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Udale-Smith Dr | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Judith Harries | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wendy Tottle | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.70k | £184.03k | £164.35k | £214.37k | £270.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.96k | £190.38k | £147.57k | £179.04k | £201.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.72k | N/A | N/A | £11.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Matthews Church
Widcombe Hill
BATH
BA2 6AA
- Phone:
- 01225465065
- Email:
- finance@widcombe.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window