MASJID ABU BAKR TRUST

Charity number: 1185364
Charity reporting is up to date (135 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Mosque and Islamic community centre for the people of Billesley

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £33,602
Total expenditure: £32,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MASJID ABUBAKR BILLESLEY LTD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Muhammad Shiraz Chair 01 January 2019
None on record
MOHAMMED NISAR Trustee 01 January 2019
UJALA WELFARE UK
Received: On time
Sayed Khan Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Usman Khan Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Hanif Mohammed Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Tariq Zaman Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £0 £10.00k £11.00k £33.60k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £500 £32.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 12 December 2024 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 12 December 2024 135 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
713 YARDLEY WOOD ROAD
BILLESLEY
BIRMINGHAM
B13 0PT
Phone:
07828073632
Website:

No information available