WEST CORNWALL SEARCH & RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary inland search and rescue across West Cornwall and support to other teams and emergency services across the wider UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 11 July 2019: CIO registration
- 15 December 2022: Funds received from 1163977 CORNWALL SEARCH & RESCUE TEAM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Brelsford | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ari Cooper-Davis | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Matthew Owen | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Fox-Rockley | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA CLARE SWAN | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIAN JENNINGS | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.83k | £20.20k | £33.98k | £16.82k | £14.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.84k | £10.97k | £18.08k | £15.47k | £9.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT LIFE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN EMERGENCY RESCUE SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) BY PROVISION OF A DEDICATED AND TRAINED VOLUNTEER SERVICE TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT THE EMERGENCY SERVICES IN THE OPERATION OF SEARCH AND RESCUE IN WEST CORNWALL; (B) BY PROVISION OF A BACK-UP SERVICE TO OTHER SEARCH AND RESCUE GROUPS ACROSS THE UNITED KINGDOM IF CALLED UPON AND ABLE TO DO SO; AND (C) BY PROVISION OF ADVICE AND GUIDANCE WHERE REQUESTED TO ENABLE RESIDENTS OF, AND VISITORS TO, THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL TO ACCESS AND ENJOY THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN SAFETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST CORNWALL SEARCH & RESCUE TEAM
UNITED DOWNS INDUSTRIAL PARK
ST. DAY
REDRUTH
TR16 5HY
- Phone:
- 07779724402
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window