Accounts and annual returns Coppershell Animal Rescue

Charity number: 1184018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 September 2024 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 September 2024 236 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 April 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 April 2021 76 days late Download Open in new window