Trustees ALTON COMMUNITY LAND

Charity Number: 1181579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Derrick Priestley Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
David Geoffrey Brailsford Trustee 18 February 2022
None on record
Michael Howells Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record
Dr Peter Stevens Trustee 24 April 2019
THE ROTARY CLUB OF CHESTERFIELD SCARSDALE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Christopher Fewtrell Trustee 14 January 2019
None on record
John Camp Trustee 14 January 2019
None on record