CALVARY DELIVERANCE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Rachael Oluwayemisi Macgregor | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Muyindeen Amoo Lugboso | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ogboro-Okor Loretta | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.39k | £42.74k | £65.09k | £125.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.50k | £36.24k | £56.18k | £83.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
- ORGANISATION OF VARIOUS SEMINARS AND LEADERSHIP TRAINING. - PROVISION OF WELFARE SUPPORT TO MEMBERS. - SUPPORT OTHER CHARITIES AND CHRISTIAN EVENTS. - CARRY OUT CHRISTIAN ACTIVITIES. - SUPPORT TO THE YOUTHS IN MEANINGFUL CHRISTIAN AND SECULAR ACTIVITIES. - THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION - PROVISION OF COUNSELLING TO PEOPLE IN A CHRISTIAN WAY. - SUPPORT TO THE NEGLECTED, POOR AND THE ELDERLY. - PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHARITY BOOKS, AUDIO AND VIDEO TAPES. - BIBLE TEACHING, WORSHIP AND FELLOWSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waverley House
10 Joiner Street
Sheffield
S3 8GW
- Phone:
- 07891913650
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window