CHORLEY AND DISTRICT NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recording the natural history of the Chorley area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 January 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Walls | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Catherine Thompson | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEWARD WEST | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE JOHN ROOT | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MORRISON | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK GEORGE FISHWICK | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD POXON | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NORA WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH WOAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL THOMAS SOUTHWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ANN THISTLETHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.95k | £1.85k | £2.12k | £2.56k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.28k | £1.54k | £2.23k | £3.12k | £2.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 1982 AND 24/10/1991
Charitable objects
A) TO FURTHER THE STUDY OF NATURAL HISTORY IN THE FIELD. B) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS OF NATURAL HISTORY. C) TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE FLORA, FAUNA AND GENERAL ECOLOGY OF THE AREA. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 MERTON GROVE
CHORLEY
PR6 8UR
- Phone:
- 01257275545
- Email:
- secretary@chorleynats.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window