GREENACRES CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities and community outreach
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oldham
Governance
- 10 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN ROBERT BAIRSTOW | Chair | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Dean | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Butler | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Joy Elizabeth Dean | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Fowler | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.78k | £48.05k | £43.91k | £43.54k | £48.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.53k | £53.21k | £42.32k | £37.84k | £33.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF CONGREGATIONALISM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN SCHEDULE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP IN THE OLDHAM METROPOLITAN BOROUGH, BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN CONGREGATIONAL MESSAGES OF AN INSPIRATIONAL AND TEACHING NATURE, HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT CONGREGATIONAL BELIEFS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENACRES CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH
GALLAND STREET
OLDHAM
OL4 3EU
- Phone:
- 01616262018
- Email:
- Jedean123@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
greenacreschurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window