TIVERTON MUSEUM OF MID DEVON LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a museum and information service at the Museum and to advance education for the public benefit and to promote the history of Tiverton and Mid Devon as told through its heritage, landscapes and stories of the people in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £36,500 from 7 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 11 February 2019: CIO registration
- 14 April 2022: Funds received from 239531 TIVERTON AND MID DEVON MUSEUM TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Ponder | Chair | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Felicity Jane Colthorpe | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Mary Payce | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Elizabeth Mildren | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Alice Hodgson | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Eddisford | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
jose kimber | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Slade | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Godwin | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Jonathan Scott | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.40k | £228.62k | £179.00k | £140.70k | £195.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.03k | £120.43k | £154.57k | £171.16k | £204.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.89k | £69.53k | £56.50k | £33.45k | £36.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1)TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM AND INFORMATION SERVICE AT THE MUSEUM OR SUCH OTHER BUILDINGS, AND IN PURSUIT OF THAT OBJECT: • TO ACQUIRE ITEMS FOR ITS COLLECTION BY GIFT, BEQUEST, PURCHASE OR EXCHANGE • TO BORROW AND LOAN ARTEFACTS AND ARCHIVES RELATING TO THE AREA; • TO MANAGE, DOCUMENT, CONSERVE AND SAFEGUARD THE MUSEUM COLLECTIONS AND HOLDINGS; • TO EXHIBIT, INTERPRET AND PROVIDE PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE MUSEUM COLLECTIONS AND HOLDINGS; • TO PROVIDE LEARNING EXPERIENCES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE PUBLIC; • TO PROVIDE EXHIBITIONS, CONFERENCES, WORKSHOPS, COMMUNITY SPACE AND OTHER EVENTS; • TO RESEARCH, PROMOTE AND PUBLISH STUDIES OF THE AREA; • TO PROVIDE AN INFORMATION SERVICE FOR THE PUBLIC. 2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO PROMOTE THE HISTORY OF TIVERTON AND MID DEVON AS TOLD THROUGH ITS HERITAGE, LANDSCAPES AND STORIES OF THE PEOPLE IN THE AREA;
Area of benefit
TIVERTON AND MID DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
TIVERTON MUSEUM OF MID DEVON LIFE
BECK'S SQUARE
TIVERTON
EX16 6PJ
- Phone:
- 01884256295
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window