OTTOMAN'S SOCIAL COMPLEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health & Safety Advice, After School Activities, Language Courses (Arabic/Bengali), Job search facilities, IT Training courses, Food and hygiene awareness, Healthier Diet awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 07 August 2019: Standard registration
- OTTOMANS'S SOCIAL COMPLEX (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdus Salam Arif | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Burak Uysal | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
VEYSEL OZAYDIN | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
IHSAN ERIKLI | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mesut Cinelioglu | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £34.38k | £89.96k | £100.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £33.33k | £81.78k | £107.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 03 December 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 03 December 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 19 December 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JAN 2015 as amended on 07 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY PRINCIPALLY IN THE CITY OF LIVERPOOL AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, ETHNIC ORIGIN, AGE, DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH, POVERTY OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES, TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL, LEISURE AND INTERACTIVE PROGRAMMES TO HELP PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
132 NORTH HILL STREET
LIVERPOOL
L8 8AG
- Phone:
- 07877558272
- Email:
- info@ottomans.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window