OTFORD MEDICAL PRACTICE PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE OTFORD MEDICAL PRACTICE PATIENTS AND THE WEST KENT CARE COMMISSIONING GROUP IN ORDER TO BENEFIT PATIENTS CURRENTLY REGISTERED AT THE OTFORD MEDICAL PRACTICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 14 March 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER HASLAM | Chair | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATE DAWES | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.76k | £0 | £0 | £485 | £395 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.99k | £2.24k | £603 | £596 | £180 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE PATIENTS OF OTFORD MEDICAL PRACTICE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES, EQUIPMENT, TRAINING AND EDUCATION, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE DOCTORS OR THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OTFORD MEDICAL PRACTICE
LEONARD AVENUE
OTFORD
SEVENOAKS
TN14 5RB
- Phone:
- 01959522513
- Email:
- otfordpatients@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window