THE FATHER'S CHILDREN MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN UGANDA AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Uganda
Governance
- 10 July 2019: Standard registration
- TFCM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Stokes | Chair | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sadie Dyer | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE MECHEN | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Matt Adams | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Adams | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Polly Axford-Checkley | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.06k | £30.05k | £41.68k | £40.82k | £34.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.55k | £31.10k | £41.63k | £39.44k | £31.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 01 May 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN UGANDA AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Lodge Court
South Street
CASTLE CARY
BA7 7ES
- Phone:
- 01963351848
- Email:
- tfcm.uganda@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
aiduganda.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window