LCR PRIDE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make the Liverpool City Region is the most LGBT plus friendly in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 04 September 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Exley | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MARGARET CROFT-GIRVAN | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Amanda Grace Hilton | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.53k | £33.62k | £314.50k | £343.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.70k | £62.32k | £265.66k | £330.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £6.25k | £20.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £49.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY AND ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE; B) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH PROMOTING LGBT ARTS AND CREATIVITY BY THE PRODUCTION, PROMOTION, PRESENTATION, AND MANAGEMENT OF PLAYS, MUSICALS, CONCERTS, DANCE, EXHIBITIONS, FILMS, MULTIMEDIA PRESENTATIONS AND OTHER ARTISTIC WORKS THAT: - ARE CREATED BY MEMBER OF THE LGBT COMMUNITIES; - ARE RELEVANT TO THE LGBT COMMUNITIES; AND / OR - PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. C) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; D) ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENTAL, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE BODIES TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS RUN BY AND FOR LGBT PEOPLE. E) PRODUCING PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; F) STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL; AND 2) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avenue H Q
17 Mann Island
LIVERPOOL
L3 1BP
- Phone:
- 07844877509
- Email:
- info@lcrpride.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window