The Order of Grace

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Order of Grace is a christian community that serves The Grace Network TGN community. Our members seek to practice justice, hospitality, prayer and presence. We work within and support the social enterprises that are part of TGN. We arrange various regular gatherings within our warehouses to inspire and practice these four practices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 August 2019: CIO registration
- WAYFARERS MONASTERY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Nottingham | Chair | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edward Paul Sauven | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cara Mansell | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Burfitt | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600 | £41.24k | £35.47k | £24.60k | £12.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74 | £20.61k | £37.28k | £34.08k | £17.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Aug 2019 as amended on 08 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS; LECTURES AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The West Suite
The Mills
Brimscombe Port Brimscombe Hill
Brimscombe
Stroud
- Phone:
- 07808720705
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window