HOUSE OF THE OPEN DOOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The House of the Open Door is based in Worcestershire. Its purpose is to advance the Christian faith in accordance with its Statement of Faith. It operates a Christian Retreat Centre and serves a local and wider community, church groups, prisoners, individuals in need and young people through prayer, hospitality and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Gloucestershire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 May 2019: CIO registration
- 04 February 2021: Funds received from 1064343 HOUSE OF THE OPEN DOOR
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Swinford | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev John Anthony Proctor OBE | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Trimming | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Denise Watson | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Silvie Jelinkova | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE PALKA | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mitton | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.22k | £62.30k | £99.47k | £118.52k | £80.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.18k | £90.32k | £82.84k | £86.55k | £102.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 May 2019
Charitable objects
“TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE UK IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOUSE OF THE OPEN DOOR
CHILDSWICKHAM HOUSE
BUCKLAND ROAD
CHILDSWICKHAM
BROADWAY
WR12 7HH
- Phone:
- 01386852084
- Email:
- hod@houseoftheopendoor.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window