THE HULL LIGHTHOUSE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides outreach support, both day and evening, along with peer group support sessions to women working in prostitution, and other vulnerable women, in the city of Hull. We offer friendship, advice and opportunity for change, including practical help and advice on sexual and general health, and housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £72,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 17 September 2019: CIO registration
- 12 May 2022: Funds received from 1070382 THE HULL LIGHTHOUSE PROJECT
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Lesley Honey | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Watson | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Ross | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janice Lucy Farley | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.20k | £182.90k | £115.18k | £107.20k | £276.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30 | £95.74k | £110.30k | £122.03k | £167.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.87k | N/A | N/A | £72.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOMEN WORKING IN PROSTITUTION AND OTHER VULNERABLE WOMEN IN THE CITY OF HULL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF OUTREACH AND SUPPORT SERVICES, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION AS WELL AS SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT SERVICES AND BENEFITS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hull Lighthouse Project
31 Beverley Road
Hull
HU3 1XH
- Phone:
- 01482442953
- Email:
- hello@hulllighthouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window