THE GREAT DALBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide and maintain a village hall in the small rural village of Great Dalby in Leicestershire, that offers a range of facilities to support community activities. Examples include a pre-school using the hall 5 days a week, a range of local clubs, that has reduced since coronavirus but includes table tennis and Yoga, as well hire for local functions and parking for the local school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £260 from 1 government contract(s) and £3,496 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 18 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Pride | Chair | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Fryer | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Winn | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.83k | £17.83k | £12.69k | £7.86k | £13.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.76k | £9.12k | £4.31k | £10.14k | £20.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £360 | N/A | £240 | £250 | £260 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.67k | £6.00k | £150 | £3.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT DALBY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GREAT DALBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
19 Top End
Great Dalby
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE14 2HA
- Phone:
- 07799328509
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window