THE NATIONAL HIV STORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, events, film production, etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 October 2019: CIO registration
- THE AIDS SINCE THE 80S PROJECT (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Scott Costen | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Walter Ruiz | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Ingle | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles George Thorogood | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ERICA CHRISTINE PIENAAR BA MBAFRSA | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ALLEN WATSON | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rosemary Pimblett | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Douglas Coleman | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.20k | £51.50k | £27.18k | £13.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.78k | £37.73k | £46.16k | £6.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF THE HIV/AIDS EPIDEMIC OF THE 1980S AND 1990S BY MAKING AVAILABLE RECORDINGS OF FIRST-HAND TESTIMONY OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY THE HIV/AIDS EPIDEMIC AND OTHER RELATED EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND MATERIALS IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH PERSONS’ EXPERIENCES AND HIV/AIDS 2. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING CARE AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 York Villas
BRIGHTON
BN1 3TS
- Phone:
- 07905031153
- Email:
- cc@nhst.org.uk
- Website:
-
NHST.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window