VITAMIN ANGELS UK

Charity number: 1190247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We assist in the provision of nutrients for the benefit of mothers and children to work to end malnutrition and its consequences among at-risk, hard-to-reach populations, focusing on children under five years of age and pregnant and their unborn child. In the UK, we work to improve nutrition for preschoolaged children by introducing supplementary feeding programmes in underserved communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £82,957
Total expenditure: £114,360

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Patrick Harley-Martin Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
WILLIAM GEORGE MOSS Trustee 14 November 2019
None on record
William Stephen John Hood Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
David Patrick Lewis QC Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £82.58k £78.67k £82.96k
Total expenditure £73.00k £97.18k £114.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOWARD KENNEDY LLP
1 LONDON BRIDGE
LONDON
SE1 9BG
Phone:
0018055648400