SMILING FAMILIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support and friendship to families with a member affected by serious/terminal illness or disability,through activities,group sessions,financial support and wish granting. Specialising is Christmas visits to families unable to travel to Lapland or a local grotto due to their health issue,by bringing a mobile grotto to their homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Solihull
Governance
- 12 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
kerry martin-Beades | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Loveland | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Owen Martin-Beades | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Martin-Beades | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.16k | £44.69k | £34.30k | £68.99k | £54.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.88k | £32.94k | £32.00k | £61.50k | £42.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE AFFECTED BY SERIOUS / TERMINAL ILLNESS THROUGH ACTIVITIES, DAYS OUT, SHORT BREAKS, RESPITE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND FRIENDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Peace Court
Hampton-in-Arden
SOLIHULL
B92 0AW
- Phone:
- 01675442761
- Email:
- smile@smilingfamilies.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window