DARLINGTON VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1182008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian religion for the public benefit in accordance with the Statement of Faith in the Schedule hereto attached in such parts of the United Kingdom and the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £275,296
Total expenditure: £275,540

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Michael Crosby Chair 12 February 2019
None on record
Robert Stephens Trustee 08 February 2023
None on record
Keith Morley Trustee 11 December 2019
None on record
Bethany Laura Armstrong Trustee 12 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.61k £67.71k £128.24k £216.50k £275.30k
Total expenditure £34.55k £65.31k £128.45k £216.66k £275.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Darlington Vineyard Church
Salt Yard
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 7DX
Phone:
07904389443
Website:

darlingtonvineyard.church