Valley Invicta at Kings Hill PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are here to encourage closer links between home and school. Fundraising events provide an opportunity for parents, staff and pupils to enjoy time together . the funds raised help to enrich our children's education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 January 2019: Standard registration
- Valley Invicta Primary School at Kings Hill PTA (Working name)
- KINGS HILL VIPS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Willis | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam Keone | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shantelle Mary Found | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Katrina Caroline Hall | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/07/2020 | 19/07/2021 | 19/07/2022 | 19/07/2023 | 19/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.25k | £4.91k | £6.88k | £17.84k | £17.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.21k | £2.72k | £6.33k | £19.21k | £16.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 July 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2021 | 06 July 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2020 | 06 July 2022 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 FEB 2018 as amended on 12 Sept 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Valley Invicta Primary School
4 Warwick Way
Kings Hill
WEST MALLING
ME19 4AL
- Phone:
- 01732841695
- Email:
- office@kingshill.viat.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window