WOODBRIDGE TIDE MILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation and maintenance of the Woodbridge Tide Mill Museum. The present Mill was built in 1793 and is Grade I listed. The Mill is open to the public and produces and sells its own flour. Guided tours and special events for schools take place.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 June 2019: CIO registration
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 274146 WOODBRIDGE TIDE MILL TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHRISTOPHER CARRINGTON | Chair | 04 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jayen Raithatha | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robin Saunders | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ryan | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jacob | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Peeke | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Lady Vicki Jessel | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Sutton | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Edwin Holdcroft | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.78k | £67.96k | £88.22k | £73.03k | £79.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.78k | £84.47k | £75.13k | £79.70k | £79.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | £28.21k | £27.44k | £7.50k | £11.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE BUILDING KNOWN AS THE TIDE MILL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND PRIMARILY THE INHABITANTS OF WOODBRIDGE IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND OF HISTORICAL AND TECHNICAL IMPORTANCE, AND TO MAINTAIN A MUSEUM OF SOCIAL AND CULTURAL HISTORY, RETAINED FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PRESENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AVAILABLE TO THE INHABITANTS OF WOODBRIDGE AND TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodbridge Tide Mill
Tide Mill Way
Woodbridge
IP12 1BY
IP12 1BY
- Phone:
- 01394388202
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window