ST GEORGE'S DANCE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club provides opportunities to learn and develop their dancing skills. The club meets regularly three times a week; Tuesday evenings, Wednesday afternoons and Saturday evenings. Everyone is welcome. The club provides opportunities for other community and social groups to use its premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 31 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Graham Patrick Dixon | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stuart Howard | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Ruth Howard | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Fear | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STANILAND | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.84k | £28.58k | £3.13k | £10.61k | £24.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.66k | £7.55k | £9.44k | £14.06k | £28.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- 3.1 TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF, AND VISITORS TO, HARROGATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL DANCING FOR THE OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING BOTH THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND VISITORS. 3.2 TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ART OF DANCE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO TRADITIONAL SEQUENCE AND BALLROOM DANCES AS PART OF OUR CULTURAL HERITAGE AND TO MAINTAIN THE TRADITIONS OF DANCING BY ORGANISING AND PROMOTING SOCIAL DANCE EVENTS ON A REGULAR BASIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GEORGES DANCE & SPORTS CLUB
ST. GEORGES ROAD
HARROGATE
HG2 9ER
- Phone:
- 01132286038
- Email:
- p.staniland@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window