AFFORDABLE COUNSELLING AND CARING EMOTIONAL SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1183314
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We offer counselling and emotional support services to anyone aged 6 years and above. We provide individual and family mediation and therapy on an affordable basis.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2020

Total income: £492
Total expenditure: £3

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 2019: CIO registration
  • 10 November 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 10 November 2021: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ACCESS COUNSELLING (Previous name)
  • AFFORDABLE COUNSELLING & CARING EMOTIONAL SUPPORT SERVICES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020
Total gross income £492
Total expenditure £3
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 07 February 2021 On Time