THE RACHEL KAY-SHUTTLEWORTH TEXTILE COLLECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The RBK-S Collection is housed at Gawthorpe Hall near Burnley. Some items are on display and accessible to the public when the Hall is open. The Trustees' main activity is to look after the Collection and use it for study and educational purposes. Some donated items continue to be accepted into the Collection.Courses and study visits are available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 February 2019: CIO registration
- 07 January 2021: Funds received from 516227 THE RACHEL KAY-SHUTTLEWORTH TEXTILE COLLECTIONS
- GAWTHORPE TEXTILES COLLECTION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baron Charles Shuttleworth KG, KCVO | Chair | 24 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Tom Kay-Shuttleworth | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Steels | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Ian Brown | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dennis Mendoros OBE DL | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Georgiana Foster | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Millward | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
ASHLEY SUTCLIFFE | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH RACHEL JANE FIGGINS | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.22k | £146.64k | £136.94k | £151.21k | £209.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.11k | £115.08k | £122.40k | £150.90k | £177.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.80k | £104.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RACHEL BEATRICE KAY-SHUTTLEWORTH COLLECTION OF WOVEN, EMBROIDERED AND OTHER MATERIALS, TAPESTRIES AND GARMENTS, BOOKS, OBJECTS D'ART AND OTHER ARTICLES TOGETHER WITH ANY FURTHER ACQUISITIONS MADE BY THE CHARITY ("THE COLLECTION") THAT MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY OR IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE ANY INTEREST; (2) TO PROVIDE A CRAFT CENTRE FOR THE STUDY AND DISPLAY OF THE COLLECTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF ARTS AND CRAFTS AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT THEREOF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KAY SHUTTLEWORTH ESTATES
ESTATE OFFICE
COWAN BRIDGE
CARNFORTH
LA6 2HS
- Phone:
- 01524271445
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window