EXMOOR YOUNG VOICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EYV is a body that supports young people on and around the environs of the Exmoor National Park. Due to planning restrictions young people find it very difficult to stay and work in the National Park. EYV has been set up to support these young people and negotiate with local authorities to find a lasting solution to this problem.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £50 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 18 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Lock | Chair | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Anthony Smith | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Ruth Williams | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Ruthven-Tyers | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Silverlock | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.15k | £5.84k | £24.54k | £11.93k | £3.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.74k | £4.41k | £1.34k | £7.56k | £12.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.54k | £3.43k | £50 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF EXMOOR, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO CAPACITY AND SKILLS AMONG YOUNG ADULTS UNDER THE AGE OF 30, IN SUCH WAYS THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY BY: •PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING THROUGH EXPERIENCE; •WORKING TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES TO RAISE ISSUES AND SUGGEST SOLUTIONS TO STAKEHOLDERS; •INVOLVING YOUNG ADULTS IN COLLABORATIVE EFFORT SO THAT THEY GAIN CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN ABILITY AND THE ABILITY TO INFLUENCE DECISIONS THAT AFFECT THEM. •BY HELPING YOUNG ADULTS LIVING IN OR NEAR THE RURAL AREAS OF EXMOOR TO DEVELOP THEIR SOCIAL AND •ECONOMIC POTENTIAL THROUGH PARTICIPATING IN A RANGE OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES •BY ENABLING YOUNG ADULTS TO USE THEIR EXPERTISE TO IMPROVE THEIR COMMUNITIES, TO SHARE BEST PRACTICE AND ADVISE ORGANISATIONS ON HOW YOUNG ADULTS CAN BE HEARD 3.2 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN EXMOOR) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUNG DISADVANTAGED ADULTS, AND PROVIDING YOUNG DISADVANTAGED ADULTS WITH WORK EXPERIENCE, INCLUDING INFORMAL TRAINING THAT SUPPORTS YOUNG ADULTS AND THOSE WHO WORK WITH YOUNG ADULTS TO REALISE THEIR POTENTIAL AND ENHANCE THEIR EMPLOYABILITY, ENTERPRISE, FINANCIAL LITERACY AND LIFE SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Post Office
Hawkridge
DULVERTON
TA22 9QW
- Phone:
- 07817708092
- Email:
- will.lock2@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window