LWS NIGHT SHELTER CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation can assist those who are homeless or vulnerably housed who are able to access the shelter. The organisation started because a demand for sheltered accommodation was identified, particularly overnight on Fridays and Saturdays, for those who are homeless or vulnerably housed. The organisation therefore aims to benefit those people by offering accommodation and food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 24 October 2019: CIO registration
- 19 September 2023: Funds received from 1153583 LEAMINGTON NIGHT SHELTER
- LEAMINGTON NIGHT SHELTER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LOUISE CHAPMAN | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Rutherford | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.08k | £50.79k | £58.64k | £33.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.63k | £23.16k | £27.74k | £26.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2024 | 331 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2024 | 331 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2024 | 696 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2024 | 696 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST HOMELESS PEOPLE, ROUGH SLEEPERS AND THE VULNERABLY HOUSED BY PROVISION OF A NIGHT SHELTER, AND OTHER RELEVANT MEANS TO RELIEVE THEIR SUFFERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Radford Road Church
Radford Road
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV31 1NF
- Phone:
- 07889214050
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window