AID INFINITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty both nationally and internationally The relief of those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability or financial hardship To provide relief after natural disasters. To advance education To help young people, especially but not exclusively through leisure time activities, so as to develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Malawi
- Yemen
Governance
- 06 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faruque Choudhury | Chair | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hafiz Mughal | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Hossain | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.34k | £16.35k | £96.89k | £87.14k | £66.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.30k | £6.88k | £91.83k | £83.16k | £60.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 September 2023 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 September 2023 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 297 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO [IS][ARE] 1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 3. TO PROVIDE RELIEF AFTER NATURAL DISASTERS. 4. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; AND 5. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 HUDSON ST
LOUGHBOROUGH
LEICS
LE11 1EJ
- Phone:
- 07801389395
- Email:
- admin@aidinfinity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window