Accounts and annual returns NEW MEANING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1184616
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 09 October 2024 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 09 October 2024 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 August 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 August 2022 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window