BEDFORDSHIRE BEE KEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beekeeping is a craft which is learned through both knowledge and practical experience, informed by evolving good practice and ever-growing scientific research. Beds BKA aims to provide a high standard of training for members, and potential new beekeepers of all ages, and a range of services to support them. We hope to enhance public appreciation of the role of bees in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
- Luton
Governance
- 17 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Andrew Rubens | Chair | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dominic Bolan | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Neil James Blakemore | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Theresa Talats | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CROSS | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Geoffrey Cockle MSc CEng | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Neil Hall | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Paul Niemann | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Howes | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Keith Canfield | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Arter | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Frances Vaughan | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jenkins | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Walter Julien Thrale | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann Long | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Glasse | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Rankin Macdougall | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Brecknell Dowsett | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Jordan | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Tysom | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Walter Alabaster | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.37k | £36.33k | £41.08k | £42.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.53k | £32.92k | £42.49k | £42.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE THE HONEYBEE BY FURTHERING THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC OF THE BENEFIT OF BEES IN THE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 High Street
Haversham
MILTON KEYNES
MK19 7DX
- Phone:
- 01908312389
- Email:
- secretary@bedsbka.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window