Trustees BEDFORDSHIRE BEE KEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1184466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Andrew Rubens Chair 01 March 2025
None on record
Mark Dominic Bolan Trustee 31 March 2025
HOUGHTON REGIS HERITAGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
Neil James Blakemore Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Dawn Theresa Talats Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
ANNE CROSS Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Simon Geoffrey Cockle MSc CEng Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Colin Neil Hall Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Michael Paul Niemann Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Phillip Howes Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Graham Keith Canfield Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Nicholas Arter Trustee 05 June 2023
None on record
Helen Frances Vaughan Trustee 25 February 2023
None on record
Christopher Jenkins Trustee 25 February 2023
None on record
Walter Julien Thrale Trustee 25 February 2023
None on record
Rosemary Ann Long Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Karen Jane Glasse Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
John Rankin Macdougall Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Richard Brecknell Dowsett Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Caroline Anne Jordan Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Jennifer Mary Tysom Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Matthew Walter Alabaster Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record