MOSES TLADI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education for public benefit by making grants for the following purposes:- 1. Promote IT literacy of children in rural schools located in Ga- Phahla villages, Limpopo Province, South Africa; 2. Support initiatives that promote access to visual arts for children in rural schools located in Ga- Phahla villages, Limpopo Province, South Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 14 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mmapula Tladi- Small | Chair | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Daniel | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tladi Small | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Ronald Small | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £0 | £587 | £2.72k | £3.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126 | £616 | £1.22k | £3.33k | £4.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS:- TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF BY MAKING GRANTS FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES:- 1.TO PROMOTE IT LITERACY OF CHILDREN IN RURAL SCHOOLS LOCATED IN GA-PHAHLA VILLAGES, LIMPOPO PROVINCE, SOUTH AFRICA; 2.TO SUPPORT INITIATIVES THAT PROMOTE ACCESS TO VISUAL ARTS FOR CHILDREN IN RURAL SCHOOLS LOCATED IN GA-PHAHLA VILLAGES, LIMPOPO PROVINCE, SOUTH AFRICA. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THEM PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moses Tladi Charitable Foundation
3rd Floor
86 - 90 Paul Street
London EC2A 4NE
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- +447448120526
- Email:
- info@mosestladi.org
- Website:
-
mosestladi.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window