GENDERED INTELLIGENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to increase understanding of gender diversity and to improve the quality of life of trans people, and young trans people in particular. We work mainly in England, but also across the UK and occasionally overseas. We run youth groups and residentials, support young people and professionals in educational settings, and provide trans awareness training and consultancy to all sectors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,426,329
Donations and legacies | £969.54k | |
Charitable activities | £450.33k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.47k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,691,279
Raising funds | £46.98k | |
Charitable activities | £1.64m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £158,093 from 3 government contract(s) and £4,709 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £46.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.64m |
People

41 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 March 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES OSBORNE | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Charlie Khe | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Alyx Faye | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Mx Amsel Mark Page von Spreckelsen | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Warren Alfred Koehler | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £842.93k | £1.14m | £1.15m | £1.47m | £1.43m | |
|
Total expenditure | £641.21k | £816.05k | £1.04m | £1.47m | £1.69m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £158.09k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.71k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £64.89k | £948.41k | £965.63k | £1.03m | £969.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £777.63k | £189.95k | £188.70k | £439.31k | £450.33k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £216 | £113 | £256 | £2.73k | £6.47k | |
|
Income - Other | £197 | £175 | £180 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £1.54k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £621.65k | £786.98k | £1.01m | £1.43m | £1.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.57k | £29.08k | £30.18k | £39.79k | £46.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £29.95k | £36.42k | £42.18k | £41.10k | £41.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £713 | £6.04k | £8.82k | £8.42k | £54.22k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £429.36k | £912.63k | £1.07m | £978.68k | £667.59k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £32.95k | £198.96k | £243.34k | £152.23k | £151.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE DIRECTORS SEE FIT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION: 4.1.1 TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION AND DECLARATIONS) OF PEOPLE WHOSE EXPERIENCE OF SEX, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND/OR SEXUALITY DOES NOT ALIGN, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, WITH DOMINANT CULTURAL EXPECTATIONS AND SOCIETAL NORMS AND WHO ARE THEREFORE VULNERABLE TO DISCRIMINATION, EXCLUSION, MARGINALISATION, HATE CRIME AND LOWER QUALITY LIFE BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (B) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (D) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (E) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; (F) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; (G) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; (H) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (I) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (J) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; (K) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (L) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. 4.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE THE UNDERSTANDING OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY OF SEX, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, SEXUALITY AND/OR THE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITIES WHOSE SEX, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND/OR SEXUALITY ARE DIVERSE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4.1.3 TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF PEOPLE WHOSE EXPERIENCE OF SEX, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND/OR SEXUALITY DOES NOT ALIGN, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, WITH DOMINANT CULTURAL EXPECTATIONS, IN PARTICULAR TO IMPROVE THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND QUALITY OF LIFE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4.1.4 FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF THE FACT THAT THEIR EXPERIENCE OF SEX, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND/OR SEXUALITY DOES NOT ALIGN, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, WITH DOMINANT CULTURAL EXPECTATIONS, AND WHOSE QUALITY OF LIFE IS LESSENED BECAUSE OF THIS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4.1.5 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4.1.6 TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY FOR PEOPLE WHOSE EXPERIENCE OF SEX, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND/OR SEXUALITY DOES NOT ALIGN, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, WITH DOMINANT CULTURAL EXPECTATIONS OR SOCIETAL NORMS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 4.1.7 ANY OTHER PURPOSE CHARITABLE IN LAW THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 4.2 FOR THE PURPOSE OF CLAUSE 4.1.5, "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR EXPERIENCE OF SEX, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND/OR SEXUALITY NOT ALIGNING, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, WITH DOMINANT CULTURAL EXPECTATIONS OR SOCIETAL NORMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Menzies
4th floor
95 Gresham Street
LONDON
EC2V 7AB
- Phone:
- 020 7155 1302
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window