ESHARELIFE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT (IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY) DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND 2. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ethiopia
- Israel
- Italy
- Kenya
- Moldova
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Poland
- Romania
- San Marino
- Ukraine
Governance
- 24 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Maurizio Bragagni OBE | Chair | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Giulia Maria Bragagni | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alessandra Romeo | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zilah Skerritt | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Martin | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Enrico Scambia | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL ANCELL | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Light | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.27k | £61.67k | £98.42k | £92.90k | £106.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.16k | £23.06k | £102.74k | £94.64k | £132.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT (IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY) DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND 2. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAIRD HOUSE
15-17 ST. CROSS STREET
LONDON
EC1N 8UW
- Phone:
- 0203 148 5176
- Email:
- info@esharelife.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window