NOIZONIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of music and arts education to underprivileged children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Islington
Governance
- 04 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tessa Kathryn Marie Bartley | Chair | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christin Rauter | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Robertson | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Williams | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Wynn PhD | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.44k | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £900 | £288 | £712 | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MUSIC LESSONS, PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 BELITHA VILLAS
LONDON
N1 1PD
- Phone:
- 07590435954
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window