ENTERPRISE FOR IMPACT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through a subsidiary company incorporated in the Democratic Republic of Congo (DRC), the charity manages the delivery of safe drinking water to the currently under-served urban and peri-urban population in Goma and, in the near future, of Bukavu, located in war torn eastern DRC .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 28 February 2020: Standard registration
- 28 November 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- E4I (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £970.15k | £338.60k | £16.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £784.25k | £422.19k | £12.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £274.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £695.83k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £784.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £61.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 5.1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED LIVING IN UNDERDEVELOPED COUNTRIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A CLEAN WATER SUPPLY; 5.2 SUCH OTHER PURPOSE OR PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; AND SUCH OBJECTS MAY, BUT NEED NOT, BE CARRIED OUT IN CENTRAL AFRICA INCLUDING IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window