BEKIND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Spain
Governance
- 05 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Greenwood | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Patterson | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Anthony Greenwood | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Strapp | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.44k | £28.00k | £32.40k | £20.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.85k | £27.00k | £32.48k | £21.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 248 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BADGERS GLADE
BURGHFIELD COMMON
READING
RG7 3RQ
- Phone:
- 01183486653
- Email:
- info@bekindrescue.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window