Financial history SISTERS OF THE CROSS AND PASSION CIO

Charity number: 1185348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £62.54m £17.43m £26.49m
Total expenditure £0 £0 £18.57m £18.62m £20.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £763.23k £27.54k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.05m £4.80m £4.51m
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £5.67m £6.16m £14.65m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £4.25m £5.01m £5.43m
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £7.90m £5.56m £5.39m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £641.34k £613.76k £939.08k
Income - Other N/A N/A £44.08m £49.95k £84.72k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £2.35m £3.11m £1.81m
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £14.51m £14.23m £15.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £4.06m £4.40m £5.01m
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £278.98k £209.47k £190.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £111.83k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £35.68k £36.55k £37.06k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0