LET'S DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes performance dance at grass roots level mainly through the production of dance shows in recognised theatres for schools and groups irrespective of ability, or experience. The age range being 5/18 years. The charity also provides leadership opportunities in production and choreography and supports teachers through the provision of on-line lessons .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Marchant | Chair | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Marchant | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Trower | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Trower | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Oatway | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.91k | £10.74k | £13.37k | £24.35k | £17.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £959 | £7.55k | £13.00k | £22.09k | £13.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 370 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF LET’S DANCE ARE; TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE APPRECIATION OF PERFORMANCE ART, ESPECIALLY IN THE FORM OF DANCE AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS BY PRODUCING HIGH QUALITY DANCE SHOWS, LEADERSHIP OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PRODUCTION AND CHOREOGRAPHY OF THE SHOWS AND LINKING THEM TO EXTERNAL CLUBS
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 ELSTED CRESCENT
BRIGHTON
BN1 8GE
- Phone:
- 07806636661
- Email:
- a_marchant@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window