BROXBOURNE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an amateur musical theatre society established in 1944 to present public performances of annual pantomimes, musicals, and other productions and associated activities, involving weekly rehearsals for adults and workshops for junior members. We have been based in Broxbourne on the Herts/Essex border since 1977.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 01 February 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott John Welch | Chair | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cera Rose Pickering Female | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Francis Curling | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Rolle | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stretch ACIS Ret'd | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.30k | £1.76k | £30.38k | £55.64k | £66.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.21k | £4.69k | £40.90k | £48.69k | £61.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, AND TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE AN UNDERSTANDING OF AND AN INTEREST IN ALL OF THE ARTS AND SKILLS OF THE THEATRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
"Bollescroft"
Cock Lane
Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire
EN11 8BE
- Phone:
- 01992449176
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window