CROSS WAY CHURCH (LEP) SEAFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal purpose of Cross Way Church is the advancement of the Christian faith following the traditions of both the United Reformed and Methodist Churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 13 May 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh Cochrane Young | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Gwynfor Owen Davies | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Bale | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nora Young | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Deanna Veronica Jenkins | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.27k | £110.27k | £130.87k | £76.59k | £75.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.89k | £75.69k | £225.87k | £64.21k | £68.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2023 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 July 2023 | 379 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. 3) IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cross Way Church (LEP) Seaford
CLINTON PLACE
SEAFORD
BN25 1NP
- Phone:
- 01323 894687
- Email:
- crosswaychurch@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window