THE ABINGDON PASSION PLAY

Charity Number: 1183512
Charity reporting is up to date (93 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Abingdon Passion Play was set up to provide the town of Abingdon on Thames and surrounding communities with dramatic representations of an aspect of the life of Christ. Planning and staging a Community Passion Play roughly once every 3 years, the charity carries out fund raising in the build up to the event in order to cover the costs associated with staging it.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £5,441
Total expenditure: £2,183

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David James Pope Chair 31 January 2018
THAMES VALE YOUTH ORCHESTRA TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST HELEN, ABINGDON
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ABINGDON-ON-THAMES
Received: On time
Samuel David Poyton Trustee 25 March 2022
None on record
ANNE MARIE GREEN Trustee 31 January 2018
None on record
SARAH ELIZABETH MEARS MA oxon Trustee 31 January 2018
THE GERONTIUS AMENITY FUND
Received: On time
John CLARE Trustee 31 January 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ABINGDON-ON-THAMES
Received: On time
Joyce Elizabeth Kelly Trustee 31 January 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ABINGDON-ON-THAMES
Received: On time
JANE ELIZABETH CADOGAN Trustee 31 January 2018
None on record
ELIANE JOELLE PONY Trustee 31 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £723 £0 £856 £5.44k
Total expenditure £888 £0 £233 £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 October 2024 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 01 October 2024 93 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Nuneham Square
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX14 1EH
Phone:
01235532120