GROVE DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clients from Grove and the surrounding area attend our purpose-built Day Centre in Grove which is open every Tuesday and Thursday (excl. Christmas). We employ several part time staff and also have several volunteers. Home cooked meals are provided each day. Activities include supervised care, entertainment, arts and crafts, stretching or other gentle exercise and mental stimulation games.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £10,110 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 March 2019: CIO registration
- 20 March 2020: Funds received from 1010797 GROVE DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley Darlison | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Godden | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Green | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynfa Blackmore | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.87k | £17.73k | £26.33k | £31.21k | £40.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.32k | £39.03k | £41.43k | £41.53k | £42.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.10k | £12.99k | N/A | N/A | £10.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO ELDERLY PEOPLE LIVING IN OR AROUND GROVE BY THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE SERVICES AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROVE DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY
SCHOOL LANE
GROVE
WANTAGE
OX12 7LB
- Phone:
- 01235770074
- Email:
- grovedaycentre@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window