Accounts and annual returns BETTER LIVES UK

Charity Number: 1188005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2024 07 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 August 2023 23 October 2024 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2023 28 January 2025 241 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 August 2022 27 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2022 27 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window