SOUTHSIDE ORG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop & maintain public education & appreciation of the arts & science of music in all its aspects especially, but not limited to the steelpan, by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of, public concerts & recitals in the United Kingdom or abroad. Provide youth and community activities, as in social engagement, activities & training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Gibbs | Chair | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Hollis | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Collette Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chander Liburd | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £6.04k | £17.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £5.80k | £17.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 April 2024 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 April 2024 | 214 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE STEELPAN, BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF, PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD. (2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 106
Elmhurst Mansions
Edgeley Road
LONDON
SW4 6EU
- Phone:
- 07958303274
- Email:
- S.HARMONICS@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window