THE GRAHAM SHAPIRO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Charity that supports mental health, well-being, innovation and young entrepreneurialism in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Graham Shapiro | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hammett | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Shapiro | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Mohin OBE DL | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hamill | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.34k | £5.76k | £240 | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £810 | £2.96k | £1.92k | £8.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE (BEING OF AGES BETWEEN 16 AND 20) IN ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY OR JUST SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE (BEING OF AGES BETWEEN 16 AND 20) WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION OR TRAINING IN PROFESSIONS, VOCATIONS, INDUSTRIES AND/OR CRAFTS AND TRADES AND/OR THE SKILLS NEEDED IN EMPLOYMENT (3) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY OR JUST SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE (INCLUDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE) AND SUPPORT WHILST THEIR EDUCATION IS BEING ADVANCED OR WHILST THEY ARE IN THE PROCESS OF ESTABLISHING NEW BUSINESSES OR PREPARING FOR ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, CRAFT OR SERVICE (4) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND ALZHEIMER’S DISEASE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FUNDS AT THE TRUSTEES’ DISCRETION FOR OTHER CHARITABLE ENTITIES WHOSE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES AGREE MEET THESE REQUIREMENTS, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND INCREASE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF DEMENTIA AND ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE (5) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FUNDS AT THE TRUSTEES’ DISCRETION FOR OTHER CHARITABLE ENTITIES WHOSE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES AGREE MEET THESE REQUIREMENTS, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND INCREASE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRAHAM SHAPIRO FOUNDATION
THE COLONY HQ
Altrincham Rd
Wilmslow
SK9 4LY
- Phone:
- 01270895237
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window