STAMFORD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Worship and other community support work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

29 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 08 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Rois Booker | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Charles Streets | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Jane Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Paul Henry Booker | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hugh Elgood Allen | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN GREENFIELD | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Whatley | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew James Lester Hollins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Francis Coles | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Husbands | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Earle | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward George Adams | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Peter Ing | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Wiltshire | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Jean Higgins | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Hetherington | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Hensman | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Davis | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Clare Hodgson | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Margaret Hewerdine | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Corinna Jeanette Selby | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Teasdale | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Howitt | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Adams | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Conan David Lewis | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Godfrey Charles Millar Jones | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Atwell King | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Margaret Husbands | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.58k | £122.29k | £122.29k | £119.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.61k | £131.05k | £131.05k | £133.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2023 | 715 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Barn Hill
Stamford
PE9 2AE
- Phone:
- 01780481795
- Email:
- admin2322@gmail.com
- Website:
-
stamfordmethodistchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window