Accounts and annual returns PEOPLE OF PRAISE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1183686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 08 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 14 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 14 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 March 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 21 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 15 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window