Financial history THE E J TAYLOR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1183039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.15k £795 £250 £457 £962
Total expenditure £26.43k £2.13k £1.92k £2.09k £135
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A